SD SB104 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 S.J. 619
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 S.J. 619
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Set the time period for when an agency may promulgate rules.
Title
Set the time period for when an agency may promulgate rules.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Vehle [R] | Sen. Jim Bradford [D] | Sen. Phyllis Heineman [R] | Sen. Timothy Johns [R] |
Rep. Peggy Gibson [D] | Sen. Jean Hunhoff [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2016 S.J. 619 |
2016-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2016 S.J. 603 |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 861 |
2016-03-09 | House | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 583 |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2016-03-07 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 789 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-03-02 | House | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 749 |
2016-03-02 | House | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 104se |
2016-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-11 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 381 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 284 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-08 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 244 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | State Affairs Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 104sc |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 150 |