SD SB104 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions concerning the investment of public funds.
Title
Revise certain provisions concerning the investment of public funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Mitchell Fargen [D] | Sen. Jason Frerichs [D] | Sen. Bob Gray [R] | Sen. Mark Johnston [R] |
Sen. Thomas Jones [D] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Rep. David Scott [R] | Rep. Charles Turbiville [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor S.J. 654 | |
2012-02-27 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 572 | |
2012-02-24 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 615 | |
2012-02-23 | Signed by President S.J. 548 | |
2012-02-22 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 557 | |
2012-02-21 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. H.J. 518 | |
2012-02-21 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-01 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 275 | |
2012-01-31 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 232 | |
2012-01-30 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2012-01-30 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 207 | |
2012-01-30 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-23 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 128 |