SD SB103 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Signed by the Governor on February 23, 2016 S.J. 408
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - Signed by the Governor on February 23, 2016 S.J. 408
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Board of Regents to transfer certain real property to South Dakota State University Growth Partnership, Ltd. for research park purposes.
Title
Authorize the Board of Regents to transfer certain real property to South Dakota State University Growth Partnership, Ltd. for research park purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | House | Signed by the Governor on February 23, 2016 S.J. 408 |
2016-02-22 | House | Delivered to the Governor on February 22, 2016 S.J. 378 |
2016-02-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 470 |
2016-02-18 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 349 |
2016-02-17 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 425 |
2016-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 405 |
2016-02-11 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 385 |
2016-02-10 | House | First read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 360 |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 267 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 0. S.J. 243 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-01-27 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations S.J. 150 |