SD SB103 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-07 - Signed by Governor S.J. 713
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-07 - Signed by Governor S.J. 713
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Remove the required waiting period before cremated remains may be released to be scattered.
Title
Remove the required waiting period before cremated remains may be released to be scattered.
Sponsors
Sen. Shantel Krebs [R] | Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Sen. Jean Hunhoff [R] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] |
Rep. Charles Hoffman [R] | Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Rep. Don Haggar [R] | Rep. Patty Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Signed by Governor S.J. 713 |
2013-03-04 | House | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 634 |
2013-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker H.J. 598 |
2013-02-26 | House | Signed by President S.J. 586 |
2013-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 529 |
2013-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 507 |
2013-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 491 |
2013-02-20 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 472 |
2013-02-19 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 443 |
2013-02-15 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 425 |
2013-02-14 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 378 |
2013-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-29 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 232 |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 248 |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 219 |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2013-01-18 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 145 |