SD SB102 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Signed by the Governor on February 25, 2021 S.J. 346
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Protect voter registration information for certain voters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protect voter registration information for certain voters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Local Government: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25SenateSigned by the Governor on February 25, 2021 S.J. 346
2021-02-24SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 24, 2021 S.J. 339
2021-02-23SenateSigned by the President S.J. 333
2021-02-23HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 367
2021-02-22HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 332
2021-02-18HouseCertified uncontested, placed on consent
2021-02-18HouseLocal Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
2021-02-18HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-10HouseReferred to House Local Government H.J. 273
2021-02-09HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 254
2021-02-08SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 211
2021-02-05SenateSenate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 202
2021-02-04SenateJudiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 1
2021-02-04SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-01-26SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 115

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback