SD SB102 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - Delivered veto override to the Secretary of State S.J. 693
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - Delivered veto override to the Secretary of State S.J. 693
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modify and continue the lease agreement on the Black Hills Playhouse.
Title
Modify and continue the lease agreement on the Black Hills Playhouse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Veto override (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Veto override (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Referred to Senate State Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Veto override (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Referred to Senate State Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | Delivered veto override to the Secretary of State S.J. 693 | |
2010-03-29 | Veto override, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 10. H.J. 870 | |
2010-03-29 | Veto override, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 6. S.J. 685 | |
2010-03-29 | Vetoed by the Governor S.J. 680 | |
2010-03-12 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 670 | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 847 | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by President S.J. 644 | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 5. S.J. 635 | |
2010-03-09 | House of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 770 Amendment 102ota | |
2010-03-09 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 4. H.J. 770 | |
2010-03-08 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 754 | |
2010-03-03 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 3. H.J. 670 | |
2010-03-03 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 5. Amendment 102jb | |
2010-03-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-24 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 601 | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 8. S.J. 440 | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 440 Amendment 102ob | |
2010-02-19 | State Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 102rta | |
2010-02-19 | State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. S.J. 385 | |
2010-02-19 | State Affairs Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 102ra | |
2010-02-19 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-12 | Referred to Senate State Affairs, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 318 | |
2010-02-12 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-27 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 146 |