SD SB101 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Signed by Governor S.J. 654
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize certain school districts to conduct school board elections during 2011 using voting centers and electronic records.
Title
Authorize certain school districts to conduct school board elections during 2011 using voting centers and electronic records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Local Government Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Signed by Governor S.J. 654 | |
2010-03-08 | Delivered to the Governor S.J. 585 | |
2010-03-04 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 711 | |
2010-03-03 | Signed by President S.J. 558 | |
2010-03-02 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 2. H.J. 652 | |
2010-02-25 | Placed on consent, Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 613 | |
2010-02-25 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-18 | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 465 | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 355 Amendment 101tta | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 354 | |
2010-02-12 | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 316 | |
2010-02-12 | Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 101fb | |
2010-02-12 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-10 | Deferred by Chair | |
2010-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-01-27 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 146 |