SD SB10 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2021 S.J. 458
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2021 S.J. 458
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the composition of the state trunk highway system.
Title
Revise the composition of the state trunk highway system.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2021 S.J. 458 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 03, 2021 S.J. 389 |
2021-03-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 467 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 384 |
2021-03-01 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 439 |
2021-02-25 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2021-02-25 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to House Transportation, Passed H.J. 168 |
2021-02-01 | House | Remove from Consent Calendar H.J. 167 |
2021-01-28 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2021-01-28 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2021-01-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 130 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 108 |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2021-01-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 18 |