SD SB1 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Signed by the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 530
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Signed by the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 530
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the use of electronic communication in the involuntary commitment process and to declare an emergency.
Title
Provide for the use of electronic communication in the involuntary commitment process and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Deb Soholt [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Sen. Herman Otten [R] | Rep. Linda Duba [D] |
Rep. Tamara St. John [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 530 |
2020-03-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583 |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 S.J. 488 |
2020-03-09 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 470 |
2020-03-05 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 490 |
2020-03-03 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed |
2020-03-03 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 107 |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading House H.J. 85 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 102 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 10 |