SD SB1 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Add a legislator to the membership of the Extraordinary Cost Oversight Board, to establish the board in statute, and to repeal the administrative rules creating the board.
Title
Add a legislator to the membership of the Extraordinary Cost Oversight Board, to establish the board in statute, and to repeal the administrative rules creating the board.
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Sen. Jeff Monroe [R] | Sen. Reynold Nesiba [D] |
Sen. Jordan Youngberg [R] | Rep. Jamie Smith [D] | Rep. Hugh Bartels [R] | Sen. Mary Duvall [R] |
Sen. Kyle Schoenfish [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2019 S.J. 642 |
2019-03-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 670 |
2019-03-05 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 618 |
2019-03-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 0. H.J. 610 |
2019-02-28 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 591 |
2019-02-27 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 566 |
2019-02-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-23 | House | First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 160 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 140 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 118 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-08 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 21 |