SD SB1 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2017 S.J. 692
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-09 - Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2017 S.J. 692
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions of the prescription drug monitoring program.
Title
Revise certain provisions of the prescription drug monitoring program.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim White [R] | Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Sen. Jeff Monroe [R] | Rep. Mike Stevens [R] |
Rep. Steven Haugaard [R] | Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 8, 2017 S.J. 692 |
2017-03-07 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2017 S.J. 654 |
2017-03-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 675 |
2017-02-28 | House | Signed by the President S.J. 591 |
2017-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 549 |
2017-02-24 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 539 |
2017-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 521 |
2017-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 477 |
2017-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 438 |
2017-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 421 |
2017-02-15 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 410 |
2017-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 393 |
2017-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 378 |
2017-02-09 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 363 |
2017-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 352 |
2017-02-07 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 337 |
2017-02-06 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 314 |
2017-02-03 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 296 |
2017-02-02 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 281 |
2017-02-01 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 255 |
2017-01-31 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 222 |
2017-01-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-25 | House | First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 194 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 189 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 169 |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 158 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 121 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1ba |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-10 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 15 |