SD HJR5004 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 30, NAYS 38. H.J. 414
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proposing and submitting to the voters at the 2022 primary election a new section to Article XII of the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, relating to the creation and administration of a trust fund using the net receipts from unclaimed property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposing and submitting to the voters at the 2022 primary election a new section to Article XII of the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, relating to the creation and administration of a trust fund using the net receipts from unclaimed property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 30 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 30, NAYS 38. H.J. 414
2021-02-25HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 414 Amendment HJR5004A
2021-02-24HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 381
2021-02-23HouseCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1.
2021-02-23HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-02-04HouseReferred to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed H.J. 209
2021-02-02HouseReferred to House State Affairs H.J. 178

South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback