SD HJR5001 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 37. H.J. 271
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To apply for a convention of states under Article V of the Constitution of the United States to impose fiscal restraints on the federal government, to limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and to limit the terms of office for federal officials and members of Congress.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To apply for a convention of states under Article V of the Constitution of the United States to impose fiscal restraints on the federal government, to limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and to limit the terms of office for federal officials and members of Congress.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-02-10 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-12SenateHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 37. H.J. 271
2020-02-11SenateHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 261
2020-02-10SenateState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 6.
2020-02-10SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-02-07SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-01-30SenateIntroduced and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 105
2020-01-29SenateFiscal Note Requested H.J. 82
2020-01-29SenateFirst Reading House H.J. 81

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback