SD HJR1007 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - Signed by Speaker H.J. 689
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-29 - Signed by Speaker H.J. 689
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing and submitting to the electors at the next general election an amendment to Article XII of the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, relating to a balanced budget.
Title
Proposing and submitting to the electors at the next general election an amendment to Article XII of the Constitution of the State of South Dakota, relating to a balanced budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 689 | |
2012-02-29 | Delivered to the Secretary of State H.J. 688 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by President S.J. 629 | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 3. S.J. 600 | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 587 | |
2012-02-24 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 554 | |
2012-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-08 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 320 | |
2012-02-07 | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 345 | |
2012-02-06 | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 3. H.J. 310 | |
2012-02-06 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-01 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-25 | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 200 |