SD HCR6009 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 424
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-01 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 424
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commending Israel for its cordial and mutually beneficial relationship with this State and the United States.
Title
Commending Israel for its cordial and mutually beneficial relationship with this State and the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Al Novstrup [R] | Rep. Sue Lucas-Peterson [R] | Rep. Aaron Aylward [R] | Rep. Carl Perry [R] |
Rep. Tony Randolph [R] | Rep. Bethany Soye [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] | Sen. Wayne Steinhauer [R] |
Sen. John Wiik [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Concurred in Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - Adopt Resolution (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - House - Adopt Resolution (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 424 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 405 |
2022-02-25 | House | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 477 |
2022-02-24 | House | Committee assignment waived H.J. 464 |
2022-02-23 | House | First Reading House H.J. 428 |