SD HCR6003 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 62-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 11 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 505
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting the Electoral College.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting the Electoral College.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution (Y: 61 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House State Affairs Concurred in Resolution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09SenateHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 505
2020-03-04SenateSenate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 412
2020-03-02SenateState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1.
2020-03-02SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment HCR6003B
2020-03-02SenateScheduled for hearing
2020-02-12SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 204
2020-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 5. H.J. 255
2020-02-11HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend resolution, Passed H.J. 255 Amendment HCR6003A
2020-02-10HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 240
2020-02-07HouseState Affairs Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
2020-02-07HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-01-28HouseReferred to House State Affairs H.J. 74
2020-01-27HouseIntroduced H.J. 62

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=HCR6003&Session=2020
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/63666.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/67482.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/69108.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/69733.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=32532&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=32836&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34062&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34365&Session=2020
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=34571&Session=2020

Bill Comments

feedback