SD HCR6001 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Supporting the amendment of the Sioux - Dakota Removal Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting the amendment of the Sioux - Dakota Removal Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - House - House State Affairs: Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseState Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4.
2021-02-05HouseState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment HCR6001B
2021-02-05HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-02-03HouseScheduled for hearing
2021-01-15HouseReferred to House State Affairs H.J. 34
2021-01-12HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 10

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback