SD HCR1032 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on March 10 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 593
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 10 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 593
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for the people of the Red Shirt community on the Pine Ridge Reservation.
Title
Expressing support for the people of the Red Shirt community on the Pine Ridge Reservation.
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth May [R] | Rep. Blaine Campbell [R] | Sen. Troy Heinert [D] | Rep. Lee Qualm [R] |
Rep. Mike Verchio [R] | Sen. Billie Sutton [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Placed on consent (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Placed on consent (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 593 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed, YEAS 3, NAYS 0. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 569 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced and referred to Senate Education S.J. 498 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 61, NAYS 2. H.J. 573 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 531 |