SD HCR1025 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Agriculture and Natural Resources Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 575
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - Agriculture and Natural Resources Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 575
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reaffirming the value of South Dakota's groundwater resources and recognizing the need for ongoing evaluation of our groundwater management.
Title
Reaffirming the value of South Dakota's groundwater resources and recognizing the need for ongoing evaluation of our groundwater management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Tabled (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 36 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 36 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 575 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 2, NAYS 5. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment c1025rb |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment c1025ra |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 497 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 36, NAYS 30. H.J. 568 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 523 |