SD HCR1019 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-6)
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 365
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 19 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 365
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Petitioning Congress to reauthorize federally provided terrorism reinsurance for insurers.
Title
Petitioning Congress to reauthorize federally provided terrorism reinsurance for insurers.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Wink [R] | Rep. David Anderson [R] | Rep. Julie Bartling [D] | Rep. Gary Cammack [R] |
Rep. Christine Erickson [R] | Rep. Brian Gosch [R] | Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] | Rep. Don Haggar [R] |
Rep. Spencer Hawley [D] | Sen. Troy Heinert [D] | Sen. Bernie Hunhoff [D] | Sen. Timothy Johns [R] |
Rep. Don Kopp [R] | Rep. David Lust [R] | Rep. Mark Mickelson [R] | Sen. David Novstrup [R] |
Rep. Lee Qualm [R] | Rep. Tim Rounds [R] | Rep. Roger Solum [R] | Sen. Jim Stalzer [R] |
Rep. Hal Wick [R] | Sen. Bruce Rampelberg [R] | Sen. Tim Begalka [R] | Sen. Corey Brown [R] |
Sen. Jason Frerichs [D] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Sen. Chuck Jones [R] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] |
Sen. Shantel Krebs [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Jeff Monroe [R] | Rep. Ernie Otten [R] |
Sen. Timothy Rave [R] | Sen. Alan Solano [R] | Sen. Billie Sutton [D] | Rep. Craig Tieszen [R] |
Sen. Mike Vehle [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 365 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Introduced S.J. 345 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 414 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 414 Amendment c1019fb |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 395 |