SD HCR1016 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 15. S.J. 502
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 2 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 15. S.J. 502
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing and encouraging support for the continued use of country-of-origin labels on meat products sold to consumers.
Title
Expressing and encouraging support for the continued use of country-of-origin labels on meat products sold to consumers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 15. S.J. 502 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Introduced S.J. 488 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 17. H.J. 713 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 698 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 661 |