SD HCR1016 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6)
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 644
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning endorsement of Taiwan's participation as observer in the International Civil Aviation Organization (ICAO), and the 28th anniversary of sister state relations with the Province of Taiwan in the Republic of China (Taiwan).
Title
Concerning endorsement of Taiwan's participation as observer in the International Civil Aviation Organization (ICAO), and the 28th anniversary of sister state relations with the Province of Taiwan in the Republic of China (Taiwan).
Sponsors
Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Sen. Angie Buhl [D] | Rep. Lance Carson [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] |
Rep. Paul Dennert [D] | Rep. Mitchell Fargen [D] | Rep. Brian Gosch [R] | Sen. Bob Gray [R] |
Sen. Jeffrey Haverly [R] | Rep. Charles Hoffman [R] | Sen. Bernie Hunhoff [D] | Rep. Roger Hunt [R] |
Rep. Kent Juhnke [R] | Rep. David Lust [R] | Rep. Nick Moser [R] | Sen. Al Novstrup [R] |
Sen. Russell Olson [R] | Rep. Val Rausch [R] | Sen. Todd Schlekeway [R] | Rep. Jacqueline Sly [R] |
Rep. Steve Street [D] | Sen. Billie Sutton [D] | Rep. Kim Vanneman [R] | Rep. Hal Wick [R] |
Sen. Dean Wink [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House State Affairs Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 644 | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced S.J. 625 | |
2012-02-29 | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 677 | |
2012-02-27 | State Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment c1016yta | |
2012-02-27 | State Affairs Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 620 | |
2012-02-27 | State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment c1016ya | |
2012-02-27 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-24 | Referred to House State Affairs, Passed H.J. 599 | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced H.J. 569 |