SD HCR1015 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 594
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the federal government to secure our national borders and enforce United States immigration laws.
Title
Urging the federal government to secure our national borders and enforce United States immigration laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 49 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 49 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 594 | |
2012-02-27 | Introduced S.J. 575 | |
2012-02-24 | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 18. H.J. 602 | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced H.J. 568 |