SD HCR1009 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-01 - Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 484
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the right of South Dakotans to own and use firearms.
Title
Expressing the right of South Dakotans to own and use firearms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | Senate | Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 484 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Introduced and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 260 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 4. H.J. 319 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 304 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 281 |