SD HCR1006 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 8 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 246
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 8 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 246
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commending and recognizing the numerous contributions made by South Dakota's social workers and recognizing March 2016 as Social Work Month.
Title
Commending and recognizing the numerous contributions made by South Dakota's social workers and recognizing March 2016 as Social Work Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 246 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Introduced S.J. 232 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 277 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 253 |