SD HCR1005 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 3 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-03 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 8. S.J. 259
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 3 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-03 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 8. S.J. 259
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging Congress to propose the regulation freedom amendment to the United States Constitution.
Title
Urging Congress to propose the regulation freedom amendment to the United States Constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 8. S.J. 259 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Introduced S.J. 245 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 56, NAYS 14. H.J. 225 |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 197 |