SD HCR1005 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 54-21)
Status: Enrolled on February 15 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 433
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 15 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 433
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing November 2013 as COPD Awareness Month.
Title
Recognizing November 2013 as COPD Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 433 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced S.J. 411 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 368 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 324 |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 302 |