SD HCR1005 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 7 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 297
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 7 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-07 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 297
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging Congress to clearly delegate responsibility for the regulation of hydraulic fracturing to the states.
Title
Urging Congress to clearly delegate responsibility for the regulation of hydraulic fracturing to the states.
Sponsors
Rep. Lora Hubbel [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Rep. Melissa Magstadt [R] | Sen. Betty Olson [R] |
Sen. Todd Schlekeway [R] | Rep. Manny Steele [R] | Rep. Mark Venner [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 50 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 297 | |
2012-02-06 | Introduced S.J. 277 | |
2012-02-02 | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 16. H.J. 296 | |
2012-02-01 | Introduced H.J. 273 |