SD HCR1005 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 430
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 430
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for raising public awareness of the disease of lupus.
Title
Expressing support for raising public awareness of the disease of lupus.
Sponsors
Sen. Deb Peters [R] | Rep. Val Rausch [R] | Sen. Timothy Rave [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 430 | |
2011-02-14 | Introduced S.J. 412 | |
2011-02-10 | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 356 | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced H.J. 336 |