SD HCR1004 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 30 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 10. S.J. 212
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 30 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-30 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 10. S.J. 212
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting and encouraging the academic study of the Bible in South Dakota public schools.
Title
Supporting and encouraging the academic study of the Bible in South Dakota public schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-30 | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 10. S.J. 212 | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced S.J. 191 | |
2012-01-25 | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 13. H.J. 193 | |
2012-01-24 | Introduced H.J. 172 |