SD HCR1003 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Enrolled on February 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-03 - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 317
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-03 - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 317
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting the Federal Communications Commission to make substantive changes to the National Broadband Plan.
Title
Requesting the Federal Communications Commission to make substantive changes to the National Broadband Plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Corey Brown [R] | Sen. Justin Cronin [R] | Sen. Jason Frerichs [D] | Rep. Brian Gosch [R] |
Sen. Bob Gray [R] | Sen. Bernie Hunhoff [D] | Rep. Roger Hunt [R] | Rep. David Lust [R] |
Sen. Russell Olson [R] | Rep. Val Rausch [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-03 | Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 317 | |
2011-02-02 | Introduced S.J. 294 | |
2011-02-01 | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 244 Amendment c1003ja | |
2011-02-01 | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 244 | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced H.J. 214 |