SD HCR1003 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 21 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-21 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 21 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-21 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 105
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the reintroduction of horse slaughter and processing operations in the United States.
Title
Supporting the reintroduction of horse slaughter and processing operations in the United States.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Brunner [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] | Rep. Don Kopp [R] |
Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Rep. Larry Rhoden [R] | Sen. Dennis Schmidt [R] |
Rep. Jacqueline Sly [R] | Rep. Mike Verchio [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-21 | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 105 | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced S.J. 90 | |
2010-01-19 | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 1. H.J. 107 | |
2010-01-15 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 53 | |
2010-01-14 | Introduced H.J. 44 |