SD HCR1002 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Enrolled on February 3 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 295
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 3 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 295
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urging an external audit of the Indian Health Service by an act of Congress.
Title
Urging an external audit of the Indian Health Service by an act of Congress.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | House | Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 295 |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced S.J. 271 |
2017-02-01 | House | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 245 |
2017-01-26 | House | Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2017-01-26 | House | Health and Human Services Motion to amend resolution, Passed Amendment c1002ba |
2017-01-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-01-20 | House | Introduced and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 95 |