SD HCR1002 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 21 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-21 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 6. S.J. 104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 21 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-21 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 6. S.J. 104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting federal natural resource agencies to refrain from designating wilderness or roadless areas in South Dakota without Legislative approval.
Title
Requesting federal natural resource agencies to refrain from designating wilderness or roadless areas in South Dakota without Legislative approval.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Brunner [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Sen. Mark Kirkeby [R] | Rep. Don Kopp [R] |
Sen. Ryan Maher [R] | Sen. Betty Olson [R] | Rep. Larry Rhoden [R] | Sen. Dennis Schmidt [R] |
Rep. Jacqueline Sly [R] | Rep. Mike Verchio [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 48 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 48 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-21 | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 6. S.J. 104 | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced S.J. 90 | |
2010-01-19 | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 48, NAYS 19. H.J. 107 | |
2010-01-15 | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 53 | |
2010-01-14 | Introduced H.J. 43 |