SD HCR1001 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 17. S.J. 482
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 17. S.J. 482
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Calling for statewide recognition of the migration of many young people from our state and urging state and local officials to take steps to counter that action and attract new residents to our state.
Title
Calling for statewide recognition of the migration of many young people from our state and urging state and local officials to take steps to counter that action and attract new residents to our state.
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Rasmussen [R] | Rep. Dan Ahlers [D] | Rep. Thomas Brunner [R] | Rep. Roger Chase [R] |
Sen. Mary Duvall [R] | Rep. Bob Glanzer [R] | Rep. Spencer Gosch [R] | Rep. Lana Greenfield [R] |
Rep. Tom Holmes [R] | Rep. Greg Jamison [R] | Rep. Jason Kettwig [R] | Rep. Oren Lesmeister [D] |
Rep. Sam Marty [R] | Sen. Tim Reed [R] | Rep. Ray Ring [D] | Sen. Wayne Steinhauer [R] |
Rep. Marli Wiese [R] | Rep. Mark Willadsen [R] | Sen. Susan Wismer [D] | Rep. Nancy York [R] |
Sen. Arthur Rusch [R] | Sen. Jim Bolin [R] | Sen. Joshua Klumb [R] | Sen. Ryan Maher [R] |
Sen. Deb Soholt [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Senate Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 17. S.J. 482 |
2018-02-13 | House | Education Title amended, Passed S.J. 444 Amendment c1001ata |
2018-02-13 | House | Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. |
2018-02-13 | House | Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment c1001aa |
2018-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced and referred to Senate Education S.J. 386 |
2018-02-05 | House | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 51, NAYS 17. H.J. 331 |
2018-02-02 | House | Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 309 |
2018-02-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to House Education, Passed H.J. 125 |
2018-01-19 | House | Introduced H.J. 109 |