SD HCR1001 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Enrolled on January 21 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 84
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on January 21 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 84
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging school districts to build on their individual strengths by working together with other school districts to provide a rich educational opportunity for all students.
Title
Encouraging school districts to build on their individual strengths by working together with other school districts to provide a rich educational opportunity for all students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Concurred in Resolution (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Adopt Resolution (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senate Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 84 |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced S.J. 80 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | House of Representatives Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 42 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 37 |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced H.J. 11 |