SD HB1313 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 H.J. 795
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 H.J. 795
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the licensing of certain alcoholic beverage manufacturers.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the licensing of certain alcoholic beverage manufacturers.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Rounds [R] | Rep. Spencer Gosch [R] | Rep. Phil Jensen [R] | Sen. John Wiik [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Concurred in amendments (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 22, 2018 H.J. 795 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 777 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2018 H.J. 778 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 760 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 730 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 723 Amendment 1313fta |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 1. S.J. 722 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 657 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1313oa |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 581 |
2018-02-22 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 1. H.J. 557 |
2018-02-21 | House | Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 519 |
2018-02-21 | House | Amend the amendment, Passed Amendment 1313fa |
2018-02-21 | House | Amend the amendment, Passed Amendment 1313wb |
2018-02-21 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1313wa |
2018-02-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-01 | House | First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 290 |