SD HB1306 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Make an appropriation to rural access infrastructure funds and to declare an emergency.
Title
Make an appropriation to rural access infrastructure funds and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Joint - Motion to amend (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Referred as Amended to (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Do Pass Amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Referred as Amended to (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Motion to amend (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 28, 2022 H.J. 688 |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2022 H.J. 686 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 538 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 684 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 507 |
2022-03-09 | House | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 1. H.J. 646 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. Amendment 1306F |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 491 |
2022-03-08 | House | House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 631 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 472 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 472 Amendment 1306E |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1306C |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-23 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 328 |
2022-02-23 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 448 |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. H.J. 1 |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 1 Amendment 1306B |
2022-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1 |
2022-02-10 | House | Transportation Referred as Amended to House Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1. |
2022-02-10 | House | Transportation Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. Amendment 1306A |
2022-02-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-02 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 182 |