SD HB1294 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2020 H.J. 628
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriate money for the ordinary expenses of the legislative, judicial, and executive departments of the state, the expenses of state institutions, interest on the public debt, and for common schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriate money for the ordinary expenses of the legislative, judicial, and executive departments of the state, the expenses of state institutions, interest on the public debt, and for common schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30SenateSigned by the Governor on March 27, 2020 H.J. 628
2020-03-12SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President S.J. 552
2020-03-12SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 2. S.J. 551
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 618
2020-03-12SenatePlaced on calendar, Passed S.J. 550
2020-03-12SenateFirst read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 550
2020-03-12HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 8. H.J. 606
2020-03-12HousePlaced on calendar, Passed H.J. 605
2020-03-12HouseFirst read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 605
2020-03-12SenateJoint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 1.

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback