SD HB1286 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Signed by the Governor on March 08, 2022 H.J. 626
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Signed by the Governor on March 08, 2022 H.J. 626
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permit municipalities to contribute more to the cost of insurance provided to certain officers or retired employees.
Title
Permit municipalities to contribute more to the cost of insurance provided to certain officers or retired employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Becky Drury [R] | Sen. VJ Smith [R] | Sen. Helene Duhamel [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - Do Pass (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - Do Pass (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 08, 2022 H.J. 626 |
2022-03-01 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 01, 2022 H.J. 498 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 416 |
2022-02-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 483 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 384 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 320 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 293 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-10 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 233 |
2022-02-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 15. H.J. 251 |
2022-02-08 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. |
2022-02-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2022-02-02 | House | Referred to House Local Government H.J. 183 |
2022-02-01 | House | First Reading House H.J. 166 |