SD HB1284 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Transportation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Create a road improvement priority fund and to provide for the distribution of the fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Create a road improvement priority fund and to provide for the distribution of the fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - House - House Transportation Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Taxation Referred as Amended to House Transportation (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-25HouseTransportation Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4.
2020-02-25HouseTransportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1284B
2020-02-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-02-20HouseReferred to House Transportation, Passed H.J. 335
2020-02-20HouseTaxation Referred as Amended to House Transportation, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1.
2020-02-20HouseTaxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1284A
2020-02-20HouseScheduled for hearing
2020-02-11HouseReferred to House Taxation H.J. 257
2020-02-06HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 210

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback