SD HB1283 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise the liability of a guarantor.
Title
Revise the liability of a guarantor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5. |
2020-02-21 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1283B |
2020-02-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-19 | House | Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1283A |
2020-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 257 |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading House H.J. 210 |