SD HB1277 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-02 - Committee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation for the installation of a sprinkler system at the State Veterans' Cemetery and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation for the installation of a sprinkler system at the State Veterans' Cemetery and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Appropriations: Tabled (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateCommittee on Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
2021-03-02SenateScheduled for hearing S.J. 1
2021-02-24SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Committee on Appropriations S.J. 340
2021-02-23HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 4. H.J. 365
2021-02-22HouseCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
2021-02-22HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-02-16HouseReferred to House Committee on Appropriations H.J. 293
2021-02-04HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 209

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback