SD HB1273 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 727
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-02 - Signed by Governor H.J. 727
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit the sale of loose leaf incense to minors, to prohibit certain marketing techniques, to regulate the sale of certain types of incense, to provide penalties therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Title
Prohibit the sale of loose leaf incense to minors, to prohibit certain marketing techniques, to regulate the sale of certain types of incense, to provide penalties therefor, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 66 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-02 | Signed by Governor H.J. 727 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by Speaker H.J. 689 | |
2012-02-29 | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 688 | |
2012-02-29 | Signed by President S.J. 629 | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 598 | |
2012-02-27 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 587 | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 556 | |
2012-02-23 | Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 516 | |
2012-02-23 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-15 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 440 | |
2012-02-14 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 474 | |
2012-02-13 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 448 | |
2012-02-13 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1273ra | |
2012-02-13 | Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1273jb | |
2012-02-13 | Judiciary Title amended, Passed Amendment 1273rta | |
2012-02-13 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-26 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 223 |