SD HB1268 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 78-11)
Status: Vetoed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Veto override, Failed, YEAS 39, NAYS 24. H.J. 799
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Veto override, Failed, YEAS 39, NAYS 24. H.J. 799
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for revised dates to prefile legislation.
Title
Provide for revised dates to prefile legislation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House Veto override (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Motion to amend (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Motion to amend (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Veto override, Failed, YEAS 39, NAYS 24. H.J. 799 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor on March 23, 2018 H.J. 797 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 788 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2018 H.J. 791 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 790 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 20, NAYS 11. S.J. 757 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 6. H.J. 741 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 718 Amendment Cc1268a |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 738 Amendment cc1268a |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 691 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 667 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 663 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 620 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 16. S.J. 619 Amendment 1268wa |
2018-02-26 | Senate | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 596 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-02-15 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 486 |
2018-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 456 |
2018-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 430 |
2018-02-12 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 413 |
2018-02-07 | House | State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1. H.J. 386 |
2018-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2018-01-31 | House | First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 250 |