SD HB1259 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Make an appropriation for rural access infrastructure improvements and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make an appropriation for rural access infrastructure improvements and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - House - Concurred in amendments (Y: 66 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass Amended (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Joint - Joint Committee on Appropriations: Do Pass Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Referred to (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 H.J. 570
2021-03-11SenateSigned by the President S.J. 478
2021-03-11HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2021 H.J. 554
2021-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 550
2021-03-09HouseHouse of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 2. H.J. 536
2021-03-08SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 450
2021-03-08SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 449 Amendment 1259H
2021-03-04SenateFirst read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 418
2021-03-03HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 484
2021-03-03HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 484 Amendment 1259G
2021-03-02JointCommittee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 17, NAYS 0.
2021-03-02JointScheduled for hearing J.J. 1
2021-03-01JointCommittee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1259F
2021-03-01JointScheduled for hearing J.J. 1
2021-02-23HouseReferred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
2021-02-23HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-02-04HouseReferred to House Transportation H.J. 212
2021-02-03HouseFirst Reading House H.J. 190

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://sdlegislature.gov/#/Session/Bill/22404
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/216290.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/218909.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/219344.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/220047.pdf
Texthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/220118.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/218657.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/219090.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mylrc.sdlegislature.gov/api/Documents/219822.pdf
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/69769
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/70485
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/70662
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/70920
Roll Callhttps://sdlegislature.gov/api/Votes/70987

Bill Comments 750

feedback