SD HB1259 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2020 H.J. 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2020 H.J. 629
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify provisions regarding the discretionary formula for determining the assessed value of property for tax purposes.
Title
Clarify provisions regarding the discretionary formula for determining the assessed value of property for tax purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Taxation Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Taxation Do Pass Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2020 H.J. 629 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 552 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 475 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 535 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 437 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-03-02 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 385 |
2020-02-27 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 1. H.J. 421 |
2020-02-25 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1259C |
2020-02-25 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2020-02-25 | House | Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. |
2020-02-25 | House | Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1259B |
2020-02-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-13 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred to House Taxation H.J. 242 |
2020-02-06 | House | First Reading House H.J. 210 |