SD HB1255 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-24 - Health and Human Services Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 554
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-24 - Health and Human Services Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 554
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit the enforcement of surrogacy arrangements.
Title
Prohibit the enforcement of surrogacy arrangements.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Brunner [R] | Rep. Jon Hansen [R] | Rep. Roger Hunt [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Kraus [R] |
Sen. Bill Van Gerpen [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Tabled (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 36 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 36 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-24 | Health and Human Services Tabled, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 554 | |
2012-02-24 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-02-15 | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 439 | |
2012-02-14 | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 36, NAYS 34. H.J. 473 | |
2012-02-13 | Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5. H.J. 448 | |
2012-02-13 | Amend the amendment, Passed Amendment 1255rd | |
2012-02-13 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2012-01-26 | First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 219 |