SD HB1253 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Signed by Governor H.J. 734
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit the judicial enforcement of any religious codes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit the judicial enforcement of any religious codes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 47 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-19 Signed by Governor H.J. 734
2012-02-29 Signed by Speaker H.J. 689
2012-02-29 Delivered to the Governor H.J. 688
2012-02-29 Signed by President S.J. 629
2012-02-28 Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 4. S.J. 600
2012-02-27 Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 587
2012-02-24 Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 552
2012-02-24 Scheduled for hearing
2012-02-23 Deferred by Chair
2012-02-23 Scheduled for hearing
2012-02-15 First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 439
2012-02-14 House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 22. H.J. 468
2012-02-10 Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 422
2012-02-10 Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1253rb
2012-02-10 Scheduled for hearing
2012-01-26 First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 219

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback