SD HB1250 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. H.J. 458
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. H.J. 458
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding the South Dakota opportunity scholarship program.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding the South Dakota opportunity scholarship program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Appropriations Tabled (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. H.J. 458 | |
2011-02-22 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-16 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-02-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2011-01-31 | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 226 |